KEVORK TAHTAYAN ARMENIAN COMMUNITY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education by the provision and maintainence of K Tahta Armenian Community School through the provision of grants to undergaduates and follow courses in Armenian Studies or similar subjects. To assist students who are suffering from financial hardship or who are otherwise in need due to their social or economic circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 June 2001: Standard registration
- KTACST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KARNIK TARVERDI | Chair |
|
||||||
Setrag Karanfilian | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Garo Karabeyekian | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zorik Gasparian | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN TATULIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIKEN HALADJIAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.15k | £18.15k | £23.15k | £17.15k | £27.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.16k | £6.71k | £94 | £20.09k | £10.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 October 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO UNDERGRADUATES TO FOLLOW COURSES IN ARMENIAN STUDIES OR SIMILAR SUBJECTS; (B) TO ASSIST STUDENTS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; (C) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN WHICH THE SCHOOL IS LOCATED, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING RACIAL HARMONY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 MANOR ROAD
HARROW
HA1 2PB
- Phone:
- 02088636881
- Email:
- karnik.tarverdi@brunel.ac.uk
- Website:
-
armenianschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window