Accounts and annual returns GEE CROSS HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL, PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 July 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 March 2022 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 November 2020 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required