GEE CROSS HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL, PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISE FUNDS FOR THE SCHOOL NEEDS BY WAY OF FAIRS, DISCO'S ETC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tameside
Governance
- 07 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
simon haughton | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £2.58k | £2.41k | £6.48k | £9.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £1.61k | £1.87k | £4.47k | £6.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 257 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 7 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gee Cross C of E Primary School
Higham Lane
HYDE
SK14 5LX
- Phone:
- 01613682911
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window