CRAFT CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the charitable activities of CRAFT (Aberystwyth) that are in accordance with the registered objectives of the trust - provision of renovated furniture etc to persons in neccessitous circumstances and the provision of special needs education, training and work experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
- Powys
Governance
- 20 February 2001: Standard registration
- 11 April 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- CRAFT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 18 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 22 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 20 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 11 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO ASSIST WITH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY HELPING TO MEET THE FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD NEEDS OF PEOPLE ON LOW INCOME BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RECYCLING FURNITURE WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE THROWN AWAY AND ADVANCING MORE SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTISES. 2) TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF PEOPLE BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO VOLUNTEER AND TO TRAIN, SO AS TO DEVELOP WORK SKILLS AND SOCIAL SKILLS, GAIN WORK EXPERIENCE AND ENCOURAGE SOCIAL INTEGRATION.
Area of benefit
CEREDIGION AND WEST WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window