MONTESSORI EDUCATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise and maintain standards in authentic Montessori provision nationally. M.E.(UK) has instituted an accreditation system for Montessori nursery schools. M.E. (UK) holds an annual Accredited Schools' Day and an annual National M.E. (UK) Conference. These contribute to Montessori practitioners' professional development. Trustees meet with government bodies concerning Early Years Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 November 2001: Standard registration
- M.E. (UK) OR MEUK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEX SHEPHERD | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE MELISSA WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HELEN YOUNG HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTHA MARY BROOK MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE COLLEEN LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £192 | £496 | £5.93k | £7.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £8.55k | £3.49k | £5.03k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH OCTOBER 1993, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11TH AUGUST 2000 AND 5TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MONTESSORI METHOD OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROMOTING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE MONTESSORI METHOD AND ESTABLISHING AND ENGENDERING, ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING, SUPERVISING, CONTROLLING AND PROMOTING STANDARDS IN THE MONTESSORI METHOD AND IN PARTICULAR MONITORING THE CONDUCT OF MONTESSORI EXAMINATIONS. (B) MODERATING THE EXAMINATIONS OF THOSE WHO ARE BEING TRAINED IN THE MONTESSORI METHOD AND MODERATING ANY OTHER FORMS OF ASSESSMENT LEADING TO AN AWARD OF A MONTESSORI DIPLOMA, SO AS TO STANDARDISE THE CRITERIA BY WHICH PROSPECTIVE TEACHERS OF THE MONTESSORI METHOD ARE EXAMINED WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO ENSURING COMPETENCY AND GENERALLY TO SET PREREQUISITES AS TO THE SUPERVISION AND CONDUCT OF EXAMINATIONS FOR MONTESSORI DIPLOMAS AND GENERALLY ANY OTHER CRITERIA SET TO REGULATE THE COMPETENCY OF TEACHERS OF THE MONTESSORI METHOD. (C) PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE AND STANDARDS IN MONTESSORI SCHOOLS, AND AWARDING ACCREDITATION IN RECOGNITION OF SUCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 VINEYARD HILL ROAD
LONDON
SW19 7JL
- Phone:
- 02089464433
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window