Financial history CANCER BLACK CARE

Charity number: 1086465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £97.62k £31.63k £44.50k £42.94k £118.40k
Total expenditure £96.30k £74.84k £57.55k £58.28k £124.38k
Income from government contracts N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £85.16k N/A £43.75k £42.58k £117.53k