THE RAMGARHIA BOARD, LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular gathering of attendees to SIKH religion events and functions. The provision of facilities for recreation and leisure activities for the people of Leeds in the interests of social welfare, with a view to improve the the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 23 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaminder Singh Soor | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Surinder kaur Gill | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Inderjit singh Sehmbey President | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Singh Marwaha VPresident | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHINDER SINGH BIRDI | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.65k | £84.51k | £169.23k | £208.88k | £205.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.23k | £62.49k | £65.72k | £130.74k | £119.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.66k | £20.19k | £6.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 172 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION AND CUSTOMS 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR THE PEOPLE OF LEEDS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY AND PEOPLE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CARE CENTRE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 CHAPELTOWN ROAD
LEEDS
LS7 3AP
- Phone:
- 07889175284
- Email:
- balbir.s.marwaha@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window