Accounts and annual returns ACTION RJS

Charity Number: 1083894
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2008 02 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2007 27 September 2008 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted