Headway Sussex Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports individuals and family carers following brain injury across East Sussex, Brighton & Hove & West Sussex. This includes individual and group support for wellbeing and reablement at home and in the community, information and signposting including at our centre in Newick, East Sussex. Our Living Well Programme Team helps people rebuild lives and to live well after brain injury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £368,523 from 3 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 January 2001: Standard registration
- 30 October 2020: Funds received from 1160319 HEADWAY WEST SUSSEX
- HEADWAY HURSTWOOD PARK (Working name)
- HEADWAY EAST SUSSEX LTD (Previous name)
- HEADWAY HURSTWOOD PARK COMPANY (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Bradley | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Kerr | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Yendell | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Glasgow | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Clement | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michele Fleming | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gaughan | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Morewood | Trustee | 30 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark O'Hara | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
HENRIK BJORN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £556.88k | £516.13k | £457.48k | £388.57k | £444.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £606.80k | £516.36k | £495.60k | £457.73k | £494.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £249.41k | £162.37k | £155.00k | £182.66k | £368.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.76k | £126.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £93.94k | £148.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £457.87k | £228.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £160 | £225 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £4.91k | £139.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £601.54k | £500.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.26k | £15.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.22k | £5.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 OCT 2016 as amended on 03 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE REHABILITATION AND CARE OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED BRAIN INJURIES AND WHO RESIDE IN EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND ADJOINING COUNTIES THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS ARE REQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME BY SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND ADJOINING COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Headway Sussex
Headway House
Jackies Lane
Newick
LEWES
East Sus
- Phone:
- 01825724323
- Email:
- info@headwaysussex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window