Accounts and annual returns BASILDON STAFF ACTIVITIES GROUP

Charity number: 1085572
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 09 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 28 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 07 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 07 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 14 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 02 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 07 May 2008 On Time