RABBI B Z BLAU MEMORIAL FUND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants to institutions to assist Jewish religious education and for general charitable purposes, including relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABBI NAFTALI CHAIM BLAU | Trustee |
|
||||||
RABBI ELIESER SCHLESINGER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MIRIAM NECHE LIPSHUTZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.70k | £28.12k | £41.71k | £43.20k | £42.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.77k | £34.41k | £37.07k | £44.67k | £44.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE ELDERLY OR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (4) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 SCHONFELD SQUARE
LONDON
N16 0QQ
- Phone:
- 02082117859
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window