STEPHEN HAWKING SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports children with severe, profound and/or multiple learning difficulties and/or complex medical needs from birth to eleven. It provides funding to support facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children outside of normal school hours and during school holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 24 November 2000: Standard registration
- WHOOSH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles Leather | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Wonnacott | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSY GILVIN | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
James Cooney | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NEIL SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £471 | £3.00k | £4.82k | £58.85k | £3.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.23k | £14.44k | £16.65k | £2.00k | £4.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 2000 AND 5 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STEPHEN HAWKING SCHOOL
2 BRUNTON PLACE
LONDON
E14 7LL
- Phone:
- 02074239848
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window