Financial history ALSTON MOOR COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1086670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £3.04k £3.04k £295 £487 £600
Total expenditure £688 £2.35k £824 £60 £279
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A