Financial history CHEMIN NEUF COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1084546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £408.17k £303.04k £272.18k £321.24k £311.47k
Total expenditure £385.10k £207.07k £310.73k £330.66k £332.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A