Trustees CHEMIN NEUF COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1084546

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Najjar | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charles Adrian Hadley | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Alain Marie Joseph Poujol | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sister Joanna Ewa Sikorska | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
FATHER ANTOINE PAUL JACQUES MARIE COUSIN | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ian Morley-Fletcher | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.