THE COMMUNITY SUPPORT NETWORK, SOUTH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Support Network South London (CSN) provides mental health advocacy services for clients in forensic (ie., those who have committed criminal offences and have mental health problems), in-patient and community settings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £167,057 from 1 government contract(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 24 November 2000: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY SUPPORT NETWORK (Working name)
- CSN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shani Minogue | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Scott Dawson | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Primrose Ante-Bennett | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Fiorillo | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Reynolds | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Augustine Isichei | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rascelles Mundle | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clementina Avwenayeri Okorefe | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Rahman Tanko | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Adapoe | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Manjula Roy | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lennon | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.28k | £217.33k | £233.15k | £212.03k | £207.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.35k | £274.44k | £214.49k | £252.38k | £215.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £167.06k | £167.06k | £167.06k | £167.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH JULY 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 2000 as amended on 21 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
To promote, preserve and protect the health and well-being of vulnerable persons of any age, persons with mental health problems/mental distress, persons with physical and other disabilities, carers of such persons, persons with learning difficulties and persons with autistic spectrum disorders, particularly but not exclusively in South London.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Support Network South London
336 Brixton Road
LONDON
SW9 7AA
- Phone:
- 0207 274 4490
- Email:
- info@csnsl.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window