Accounts and annual returns HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE "ABILITY"

Charity number: 1086593
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2006 20 June 2007 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 22 June 2007 22 days late
Annual return 31 July 2005 14 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 12 June 2006 12 days late
Annual return 31 July 2004 22 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 22 April 2005 On Time