Accounts and annual returns TURKISH ELDERS CLUB "PROJECT"

Charity number: 1087710
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 18 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 30 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required