Financial history BARROW IN FURNESS ROOSE EVENING TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1083494
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2007 31/01/2008 31/01/2009 31/01/2010 31/01/2011
Total gross income £4.91k £4.35k £4.33k £4.55k £4.62k
Total expenditure £4.74k £4.32k £4.67k £4.69k £4.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A