THE UPMINSTER PARK "A" TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of women irrespective of race, creed and party so as to enable them to make the best contribution towards the common good.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £7,499
Total expenditure: £7,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KIM DUNK Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Doreen Dunk Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Anne Monk Trustee 23 March 2016
SOUTH ESSEX FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS
Received: 17 days late
Pauline Barnett Trustee 25 March 2015
None on record
DOREEN PICKTON Trustee 23 October 2013
None on record
GILLIAN O'CONNOR Trustee 28 July 2013
None on record
CHRISTINE JOAN SCOTT Trustee 15 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £13.21k £5.76k £3.52k £9.14k £7.50k
Total expenditure £13.35k £5.16k £4.04k £9.40k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 10 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Aspen Grove
Upminster
RM14 2HZ
Phone:
01708221528
Website:

No information available