Accounts and annual returns THE WHITLEY BAY BRIARDENE (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1085510
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2006 08 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2005 11 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 31 January 2006 34 days late
Annual return 29 February 2004 16 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 25 February 2005 58 days late