THE RICHARD ELY TRUST FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the appreciation of music in all its aspects for young people under the age of 21 resident in or educated within the Dorset area. Financial grants are for music tuition, purchase/maintenance of instruments, membership of local & national groups, overseas tours and college courses. Income arises from donations and fund raising events organised by both the Trust and other organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 23 March 2001: Standard registration
- 02 July 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1197069 CHANGING KEY DORSET
- RICHARD ELY TRUST (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £11.30k | £34.68k | £15.05k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.92k | £12.72k | £10.25k | £7.10k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2023 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/11/2013 as amended on 24 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 21 RESIDENT IN OR EDUCATED WITHIN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND THE DORSET AREA ("AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
WITHIN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND THE DORSET AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window