THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH SHREWTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain preserve and improve the church building and its furnishings and the churchyard of St Mary's church Shrewton which is a Grade ll* listed building and to raise and receive funds to carry out this work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Richard William Dennis OBE | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Badham-Thornhill | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALWYN JENNINGS-BRAMLY | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64k | £2.23k | £5.25k | £6.09k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280 | £9.45k | £3.51k | £214 | £6.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE RESTORATION PRESERVATION IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY'S SHREWTON ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
THE CHURCH OF ST MARY'S SHREWTON ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LABURNUM
HIGH STREET
SHREWTON
SALISBURY
SP3 4DD
- Phone:
- 01980620422
- Email:
- ALWYN.J-B@BTCONNECT.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.