THE HOBSON FOUNDATION FOR CLASSICAL STUDIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Learning the language, history and culture of Ancient Greece and Rome and the classical word generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
- Greece
Governance
- 21 February 2001: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- HOBCLAS (Working name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36k | £1.35k | £1.16k | £1.36k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £434 | £435 | £519 | £598 | £660 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 27 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 02 February 2017 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND LEARNING OF THE LANGUAGE, HISTORY AND CULTURE OF ANCIENT GREECE AND ROME AND THE CLASSICAL WORLD GENERALLY ("CLASSICS") BY 2.2.1 CREATING A BASE IN GREECE OR ELSEWHERE IN THE CLASSICAL WORLD TO ENABLE TEACHERS OF CLASSICS TO TAKE GROUPS OF STUDENTS THERE TO STUDY ANCIENT GREEK AND LATIN BY LEARNING THE LANGUAGE OR READING TEXTS IN THE ORIGINAL OR IN TRANSLATION OR VISITING PLACES OF CULTURAL INTEREST AND TO DEVELOP A SENSE OF ENJOYMENT IN THEIR STUDENTS AND A SPIRIT OF COOPERATIVE LEARNING 2.2.2 ASSISTING TEACHERS OF CLASSICS TO TAKE GROUPS OF STUDENTS TO PLACES OF CLASSICAL INTEREST 2.2.3 ASSISTING GROUPS OF CLASSICS STUDENTS WITH A PROJECT WHOSE FULFILMENT REQUIRES TRAVEL TO PLACES OF CLASSICAL INTEREST AND WORKING AND READING TOGETHER IN EITHER LATIN OR GREEK 2.2.4 ENHANCING THE TEACHING OF CLASSICS AND MAKING ITS STUDY MORE WIDELY AVAILABLE
Area of benefit
GREECE, OR ELSEWHERE IN THE CLASSICAL WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window