THE BOSTON (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084514
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monthly 2 hour meeting with guest speaker, with raffle at meeting and general sales stall for members. Approx 2 local coach trips per year Approx 2 local theatre trips per year We do not give to other charities unless a member dies, when instead of flowers we might donate -ú20 to a charity of their executors choice.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007

Total income: £4,241
Total expenditure: £4,104

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2001: Standard registration
  • 30 January 2008: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2004 31/01/2005 31/01/2006 31/12/2007
Total gross income £3.67k £2.55k £2.83k £4.24k
Total expenditure £2.79k £2.46k £2.81k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 17 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2006 24 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2005 13 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2004 02 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required