KING GEORGE'S FIELD HEYBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PARISH COUNCIL CONTINUES TO MAINTAIN AND OPERATE THE PLAYING FIELD FOR THE PURPOSES WITH WHICH IT WAS ENTRUSTED UPON TRANSFER FROM MALDON DISTRICT COUNCIL. ACCESS TO THE PLAYING FIELD IS UNRESTRICTED. THERE IS AN AREA OF PLAY EQUIPMENT AND A FOOTBALL PITCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 20 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEYBRIDGE PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 15 OCTOBER 1936 AND DEED OF DEDICATION DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1938.
Charitable objects
A RECREATION AND PLAYING FIELD, TO BE PRESERVED IN PERPETUITY AS A MEMORIAL TO KING GEORGE V, UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF THE KING GEORGE'S FIELDS FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
HEYBRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PLANTATION HALL
COLCHESTER ROAD
HEYBRIDGE
MALDON
CM9 4AL
- Phone:
- 01621852471
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window