Trustees Radcliffe Townswomen's Guild
Charity Number: 1085169

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Bowman | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Sheridan | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Smith | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Garlick | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Edwards | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA EVASON | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALMA NORA OTTER | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.