Accounts and annual returns LIVERPOOL IRISH CENTRE

Charity number: 1089059
Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window