HAMPTON WICK INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity raises funds, primarily from social activities, which are used to fund events and expenditure for the benefit of the pupils of Hampton Wick Infant and Nursery School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 13 December 2000: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF HAMPTON WICK INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL (Working name)
- HAMPTON WICK PTA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Booth | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Katherine McKeon | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Namrata Moorthy | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Boyce | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.47k | £14.40k | £19.73k | £24.87k | £29.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.15k | £9.36k | £9.50k | £23.20k | £26.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 October 2023 | 477 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
HAMPTON WICK INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMPTON WICK INFANT SCHOOL
NORMANSFIELD AVENUE
TEDDINGTON
TW11 9RP
- Phone:
- 02089773971
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window