FRIENDS OF HADRIAN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please refer to attached Annual Report. The Friends of Hadrian School provide or assist in the provision of educational and recreational facilities and resources not normally provided by the LA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 19 February 2001: Standard registration
- 25 November 2021: Funds received from 509219 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF FREEMAN HOSPITAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex James Rayner | Chair | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Knox | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Mitchell | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Ann Hall | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Claire Harrison | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROLLINGS | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TODD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN STOKLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.60k | £21.29k | £50.04k | £241.70k | £60.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £14.82k | £17.23k | £1.04k | £4.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF HADRIAN SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HADRIAN SCHOOL
BERTRAM CRESCENT
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 6PY
- Phone:
- 01912734440
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window