HAEMOPHILIA & HEPATITIS C: FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2001: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £827 | |
|
Total expenditure | £823 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM HAEMOPHILIA WHO AS A RESULT OF RECEIVING INFECTED BLOOD PRODUCTS IN THE UK HAVE BEEN GIVEN THE HEPATITIS C VIRUS (NON-A NON B) WHICH IN TURN HAS LED TO LIVER FAILURE AND THE REQUIREMENT FOR LIVER TRANSPLANT OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE SERIOUSLY ILL WITH THE VIRUS AND THE RELIEF OF NEEDY SPOUSES, PARENTS CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE VIRUS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window