THE SHANKLIN (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet the 3rd Wednesday each month 7.30pm to 9.45p.m. For our main meeting with info of our sub sections 1st (Social Studies, Handicraft, Home craft, Music, Leisure and Outings) each of these is also once a month , we then have Fellowship (news of anyone ill or injured) Newsletter (any good news to shout about) and the guest speaker of the month, is followed by monthly competitons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 25 November 2000: Standard registration
- 12 December 2012: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.19k | £15.25k | £8.97k | £8.41k | £15.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.07k | £15.08k | £8.86k | £8.99k | £16.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 28 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 11 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | 09 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING):- 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD. 2. TO EDUCATE SUCH WOMEN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE. 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH WOMEN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window