SMART NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Smart works with the homeless and people who suffer social disadvantage through the arts, creating training, jobs and commercial opportunities and more importantly, giving hope and renewing self-esteem to people whose lives have been seriously damaged. Smart acts as intermediary facilitating exhibitions and workshops in the major art galleries, museums and the corporate sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 March 2001: Standard registration
- SMART NETWORK (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saroj Kumar Barua | Chair | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL STILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £3.82k | £2.01k | £1.88k | £2.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £2.44k | £1.87k | £2.99k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22ND MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE AND OTHER SOCIALLY EXCLUDED PEOPLE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. IN PARTICULAR, THIS OBJECT WILL BE ACHIEVED BY THE PRODUCTION OF AN ARTS MAGAZINE. "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED PEOPLE" MEAN PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGES WHOSE CAPACITY AND SKILLS NEED TO BE DEVELOPED BY THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CHARITY AS DETAILED IN THE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Dulverton Mansions
166 Gray's Inn Road
London
WC1X 8EH
- Phone:
- 02072780858
- Email:
- smartnetworkuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window