Financial history SOUTH THAMES ACUTE PAIN GROUP

Charity number: 1089240
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £35.40k £9.64k £21.99k £23.82k £6.94k
Total expenditure £35.58k £9.55k £18.87k £21.23k £8.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A