Accounts and annual returns HOCKLIFFE LOWER SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1084443
Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required