THE CHARLES DUNSTONE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a grant making trust applying funds to charitable causes at the trustees discretion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CLARKSON | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWIN GORDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENIS JOHN CHRISTOPHER DUNSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN BOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £663.76k | £931.64k | £0 | £960.89k | £4.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £939.83k | £187.39k | £451.27k | £208.70k | £249.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £653.26k | £925.34k | N/A | £960.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.50k | £6.30k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £939.83k | £187.39k | N/A | £208.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.40k | £13.01k | N/A | £4.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £916.85k | £169.10k | N/A | £199.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
H W Fisher & Co
Acre House
11-15 William Road
LONDON
NW1 3ER
- Phone:
- 020 7388 7000
- Email:
- jtrent@hwfisher.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window