Financial history GLOBAL CANCER CARE

Charity number: 1084809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £67.77k £66.98k £78.32k £63.07k £95.23k
Total expenditure £77.37k £66.52k £76.22k £80.24k £72.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A