THE ANGLING COLLECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and exhibition of books, manuscripts and other objects of artistic merit or historical interest in relation to the art of angling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 January 2003: Standard registration
- THE NATIONAL ANGLING COLLECTION TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JON WARD-ALLEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK OWEN | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Roland Caley | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.07k | £72 | £72 | £72 | £72 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 20 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: THE PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, ARTEFACTS, BUILDINGS AND OTHER OBJECTS OF ARTISTIC MERIT OR HISTORICAL INTEREST IN RELATION TO THE ART OF ANGLING, AND BY MEANS OF THIS COLLECTION TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND PRACTICE OF ANGLING, ITS PLACE IN CULTURAL HERITAGE AND THE AQUATIC ENVIRONMENT .
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS - HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Angling Trust
The Old Police Station
Wharncliffe Road
ILKESTON
DE7 5GF
- Phone:
- 01158224660
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window