Financial history THE COGWHEEL TRUST INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1100931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £117.61k £119.88k £114.86k £110.73k £118.81k
Total expenditure £120.25k £87.91k £102.88k £131.17k £124.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A