Trustees NORTH LEEDS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1085203

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH MICHAEL FLETCHER | Chair | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GARETH SHAW | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie de Naeyer | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Goodall | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Freya Louise Wilson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARK ILLINGWORTH | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stacy-Paul Wilshaw | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis Mark Sergent | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH MCKENNA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.