Accounts and annual returns STROUD AUTISTIC SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1085453
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 28 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 23 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 28 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 28 October 2005 On Time