Financial history PHOENIX COMMUNITY FURNITURE SCHEME LIMITED

Charity Number: 1085074
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £82.09k £90.39k £134.83k £91.03k £90.23k
Total expenditure £88.39k £97.02k £83.70k £106.22k £114.05k
Income from government contracts £45.85k £42.88k £35.98k £15.68k £6.97k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £76.74k £12.01k N/A