PHOENIX COMMUNITY FURNITURE SCHEME LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phoenix Community Furniture Scheme is based in Newtown and operate with the help of volunteers. Phoenix collects good quality donated furniture, household effects and electrical items from the public within Powys. Once in our warehouse these donated items are then cleaned, sorted, and where necessary tested by qualified staff, before being passed on to those in need living in Powys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £6,965 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 20 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Jones | Chair | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Howard | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Rachel Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elwyn Graham Vaughan | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DAVIES | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS ANTHONY REES | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.09k | £90.39k | £134.83k | £91.03k | £90.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.39k | £97.02k | £83.70k | £106.22k | £114.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.85k | £42.88k | £35.98k | £15.68k | £6.97k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £76.74k | £12.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 429 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2025 | 430 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF POWYS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD KERRY ROAD
NEWTOWN
POWYS
SY16 1BH
- Phone:
- 01686 623336
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window