Trustees PHOENIX COMMUNITY FURNITURE SCHEME LIMITED
Charity number: 1085074
Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Jones | Chair | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joy Rachel Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elwyn Graham Vaughan | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DAVIES | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS ANTHONY REES | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYN CLEWER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.