Financial history JETHAVANA BUDDHIST VIHARA TRUST

Charity Number: 1084219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.08k £21.70k £16.55k £13.08k £12.97k
Total expenditure £32.71k £19.67k £11.62k £8.05k £16.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A