Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT WESTMINSTER

Charity number: 1084656
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 22 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 22 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 26 October 2004 On Time