SYNCOPE TRUST AND REFLEX ANOXIC SEIZURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To alleviate the effects of and provide support and information on, syncope and reflex anoxic seizures, to those in distress as a result of these seizures, whether suffered by themselves or as a member of the family group To advance the education of the medical profession and the general public on the subject of syncope and reflex anoxic seizures and its implications for the individual and family
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- Denmark
- France
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 06 February 2001: Standard registration
- STARS (Working name)
- THE BLACKOUTS TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mehran Asgari | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Bateson | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr WILLIAM PATRICK AUDIFFRED WHITEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHRINE LOUISE REID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.19k | £112.48k | £135.53k | £243.61k | £121.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.70k | £56.60k | £77.70k | £72.31k | £79.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 24 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE EFFECTS OF,PROVIDE SUPPORT AND INFORMATION ON REFLEX ANOXIC SEIZURES (KNOW AS RAS) AND OTHER NON- EPILEPTIC SEIZURES TO THOSE IN DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF THESE SEIZURES (WHETHER SUFFERED BY THEMSELVES OR A MEMBER OF THEIR FAMILY GROUP).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Murphy Salisbury
Celixir House
Stratford Business Park
Innovation Way
Stratford upon Avon
CV37 7GZ
- Phone:
- 01789867503
- Email:
- info@stars.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window