ST JOSEPH'S NYMPSFIELD OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity Number: 1084550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children out of school hours and to advance the training of the persons in the provision of such care, education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £59,239
Total expenditure: £50,172

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST JOSEPH'S NYMPSFIELD OOSC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samantha Foran Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Honor Palmer Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Jessica Burchfiel Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Gemma Wilkins Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Clare Howells Trustee 01 January 2020
ST JOSEPH'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: 203 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £47.97k £31.75k £38.38k £50.43k £59.24k
Total expenditure £27.46k £31.82k £30.11k £53.38k £50.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. JOSEPHS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL
FRONT STREET
NYMPSFIELD
STONEHOUSE
GL10 3TY
Phone:
01453860311