REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ('RCCG') LIVING SPRING CENTRE

Charity Number: 1084774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian faith worldwide and the relief of poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £92,376
Total expenditure: £104,721

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RCCG LIVING SPRING CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Francis Oladimeji Trustee 06 July 2017
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ('RCCG') ROYAL CONNECTIONS
Received: On time
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) LIBERTY CHRISTIAN CONNECTIONS
Received: On time
THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD LIVING SPRING CENTRE
Received: On time
Christine Awoloto Trustee 06 July 2017
THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD LIVING SPRING CENTRE
Received: On time
Adeyemi Oludare Oladipo Trustee 06 July 2017
None on record
DEACON OLUFEMI ADEWALE OLUBANJO Trustee 29 November 2011
THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD LIVING SPRING CENTRE
Received: On time
HARINGEY FOODBANK
Received: On time
ALABA AKINDURO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £127.72k £95.26k £109.47k £123.79k £92.38k
Total expenditure £88.65k £82.87k £93.25k £100.49k £104.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Duke Aldridge Academy
Trulock Road
Tottenham
London
N17 0PG
Phone:
07462985739