RCCG OPEN HEAVENS CHRISTIAN CENTRE EDGWARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a family oriented, community centred church and we provide a place of worship and fellowship for people of all ages, cultures and race. We are committed to empowering individuals to turn their potentials to performance and to address the needs of the local and wider community. We also work with young people to develop their skills and abilities through enriching youth activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 January 2001: Standard registration
- RCCG OPEN HEAVENS FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") OPEN HEAVENS CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oluwaremilekun Balogun | Chair |
|
||||||
OLAWALE ADETOKUNBO LADAPO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADEBIMPE ADEKUNBI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.47k | £232.88k | £249.47k | £297.20k | £334.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.38k | £186.16k | £205.68k | £236.92k | £276.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH OCTOBER 2000 as amended on 23 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
194-198 BROADFIELDS AVENUE
EDGWARE
HA8 8TF
- Phone:
- 02089584040
- Email:
- info@openheavens.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window